TX HB30 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to facilitate the transfer, academic progress, and timely graduation of students in public higher education; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to measures to facilitate the transfer, academic progress, and timely graduation of students in public higher education; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Branch [R] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - HB 30Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TRANSFER STUDENTS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TRANSFER STUDENTS