TX HB285 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prohibition on posting on the Internet information held by an appraisal district regarding certain residential property.
Title
Relating to the prohibition on posting on the Internet information held by an appraisal district regarding certain residential property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-13 | House | Filed |