TX HB2725 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain records maintained by a victims of trafficking shelter center and the creation of minimum standards for certain facilities that provide services to victims of trafficking.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain records maintained by a victims of trafficking shelter center and the creation of minimum standards for certain facilities that provide services to victims of trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - HB 2725Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - HB 2725Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - HB 2725Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-20 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Open Records
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Open Records