TX HB2623 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain counties and the General Land Office to temporarily close a beach or beach access point.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain counties and the General Land Office to temporarily close a beach or beach access point.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - HB 2623Third Reading House (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2013-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-10 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aeronautics
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
County Government
County Government--General
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
GULF OF MEXICO
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Safety
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
County Government
County Government--General
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
GULF OF MEXICO
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Safety