TX HB2623 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain energy security technologies for critical governmental facilities.
Title
Relating to certain energy security technologies for critical governmental facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Marva Beck [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-05-03 | Read first time | |
2011-04-28 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-27 | Record vote | |
2011-04-27 | Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-15 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-03-15 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Energy
Energy--General
SECURITY ALARMS & DEVICES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
Energy
Energy--General
SECURITY ALARMS & DEVICES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB2623 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB02623I.htm |