TX HB2623 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to unemployment compensation modernization.
Title
Relating to unemployment compensation modernization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-04-01 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-27 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-27 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-27 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-03-16 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-16 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-12 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1421 (Similar To) 2009-03-17 - Referred to Economic Development
SB1569 (Similar To) 2009-05-27 - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
SB1569 (Similar To) 2009-05-27 - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal