TX HB245 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of emergency room physicians and certain certified emergency medical services professionals to hold a person believed to have a mental illness; establishing mental health crisis intervention certification for certain emergency medical services personnel.
Title
Relating to the authority of emergency room physicians and certain certified emergency medical services professionals to hold a person believed to have a mental illness; establishing mental health crisis intervention certification for certain emergency medical services personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-23 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2012-12-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PEACE OFFICERS
PHYSICIANS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PEACE OFFICERS
PHYSICIANS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB245 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00245I.htm |