TX HB2364 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to abortion at or after 20 weeks post-fertilization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to abortion at or after 20 weeks post-fertilization.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-11HouseReferred to State Affairs
2013-03-11HouseRead first time
2013-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback