TX HB2148 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the motor fuel tax on compressed natural gas and liquefied natural gas; providing penalties; imposing a tax.
Title
Relating to the motor fuel tax on compressed natural gas and liquefied natural gas; providing penalties; imposing a tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - HB 2148Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General