TX HB21 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a central database containing information about offenders who have committed certain offenses against children or offenses involving family or dating violence.
Title
Relating to a central database containing information about offenders who have committed certain offenses against children or offenses involving family or dating violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - HB 21Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-30 | House | Amended |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Trial
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure--Trial
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF