TX HB1501 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the commemoration of September 11, 2001, at public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the commemoration of September 11, 2001, at public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-02 - HB 1501Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenatePassed
2013-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-16SenateNo action taken in committee
2013-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-07SenateReferred to Education
2013-05-07SenateRead first time
2013-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-02HouseRecord vote
2013-05-02HousePassed
2013-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-02HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-05-01HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-30HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-25HouseReferred to Public Education
2013-02-25HouseRead first time
2013-02-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback