TX HB1421 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the disposition of certain seized weapons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the disposition of certain seized weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-06 - HB 1421Third Reading House (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-25 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-05-25 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-14HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-14HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-14SenateRecord vote
2013-05-14SenatePassed
2013-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-14SenateRecord vote
2013-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-07SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2013-05-07SenateRead first time
2013-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-06HouseRecord vote
2013-05-06HousePassed
2013-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-03-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-03-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-03-25HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2013-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-26HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2013-02-26HouseRead first time
2013-02-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback