TX HB14 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the fiscal transparency and accountability of certain entities responsible for public money.
Title
Relating to the fiscal transparency and accountability of certain entities responsible for public money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Returned to committee |
2013-05-03 | House | Point of order sustained |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-11 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
BONDS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
DEBT
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--General
Electronic Information Systems
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
SECRETARY OF STATE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--General
BONDS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
DEBT
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--General
Electronic Information Systems
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
SECRETARY OF STATE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--General