TX HB1394 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sunset review of certain powers and duties performed by the Department of State Health Services.
Title
Relating to the sunset review of certain powers and duties performed by the Department of State Health Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-26 | House | Passed |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-26 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2013-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Recommended Reviews
Health--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Recommended Reviews