TX HB1392 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information provided by the Department of State Health Services on food regulation.
Title
Relating to information provided by the Department of State Health Services on food regulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan King [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. George Lavender [R] |
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - HB 1392Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-18 | House | Filed |