TX HB1382 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of food prepared, stored, distributed, or sold at farms and farmers' markets; limiting the applicability of a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of food prepared, stored, distributed, or sold at farms and farmers' markets; limiting the applicability of a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-10 - HB 1382Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2013-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-23HouseRecord vote
2013-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2013-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenatePassed
2013-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateAmended
2013-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-13SenateReferred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
2013-05-13SenateRead first time
2013-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-10HouseRecord vote
2013-05-10HousePassed
2013-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-09HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-25HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2013-02-25HouseRead first time
2013-02-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback