TX HB1349 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information that may be requested by the Department of Public Safety from a person applying for or renewing a concealed handgun license.
Title
Relating to information that may be requested by the Department of Public Safety from a person applying for or renewing a concealed handgun license.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] |
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - HB 1349Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - HB 1349Third Reading House (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - HB 1349Third Reading House (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 1/1/14 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-22 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-04 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2013-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed |