TX HB1229 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a statewide task force to address sexual assault occurring on the campuses of public and private institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a statewide task force to address sexual assault occurring on the campuses of public and private institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS' INSTITUTE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Governor
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
SEXUAL ASSAULT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TASK FORCE ON CAMPUS SEXUAL ASSAULT
Women
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Governor
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
SEXUAL ASSAULT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TASK FORCE ON CAMPUS SEXUAL ASSAULT
Women