TX HB1223 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the temporary exemption of certain tangible personal property related to data centers from the sales and use tax.
Title
Relating to the temporary exemption of certain tangible personal property related to data centers from the sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Harvey Hilderbran [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R] | Rep. Patricia Harless [R] |
Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - HB 1223Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - HB 1223Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - HB 1223Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT
Electronic Information Systems
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Sales
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT
Electronic Information Systems
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Sales