TN SB2844 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 770
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 770
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies definitions that apply to parents in the armed forces seeking modification of orders concerning parenting. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As enacted, clarifies definitions that apply to parents in the armed forces seeking modification of orders concerning parenting. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Pub. Ch. 770 | |
2012-04-24 | Effective date(s) 04/19/12 | |
2012-04-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-04-05 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-05 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-04 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-03-28 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-03-26 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-03-26 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-22 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/26/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2188 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 770