TN SB2566 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits persons and religious or denominational organizations, based on sincere religious belief, to refuse to provide services or goods in furtherance of a civil union, domestic partnership, or marriage not recognized by the Tennessee Constitution. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 36.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits persons and religious or denominational organizations, based on sincere religious belief, to refuse to provide services or goods in furtherance of a civil union, domestic partnership, or marriage not recognized by the Tennessee Constitution. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 36.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-18SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
2014-02-12SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014
2014-02-10SenateP2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2014-02-06SenateIntro., P1C.
2014-02-05SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB2467 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-12 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback