TN SB2488 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, confers jurisdiction over public nuisance claims on courts designated as environmental courts by Chapter 212 of the Public Acts of 1993 or Chapter 667 of the Public Acts of 2002. - Amends TCA Section 29-3-102.
Title
As enacted, confers jurisdiction over public nuisance claims on courts designated as environmental courts by Chapter 212 of the Public Acts of 1993 or Chapter 667 of the Public Acts of 2002. - Amends TCA Section 29-3-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Comp. HB subst. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2035 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 789