TN SB2482 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relating to restaurants and limited service restaurants and the sale of alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions relating to restaurants and limited service restaurants and the sale of alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1174) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1026) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2406 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 915