TN SB2471 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 900
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 900
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Promise Scholarship Act of 2014"; revises certain provisions of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 7 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Promise Scholarship Act of 2014"; revises certain provisions of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 7 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 900 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/12/2014; 07/01/2015 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 8 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. no. 7 tabled, Ayes 62, Nays 30 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 6 - HA1235) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - HA1228) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - HA1225) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA1213) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1212) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0930) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA0853) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0852) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0851) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0850) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 7 of 0 - SA1148) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 6 of 0 - SA1147) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 5 of 0 - SA1146) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2491 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 900