TN SB2460 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 935
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 935
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the month of August as "Women in STEM" month to raise awareness of the opportunities for women to pursue a career in a STEM related field; STEM refers to the fields of study science, technology, engineering, and mathematics. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, designates the month of August as "Women in STEM" month to raise awareness of the opportunities for women to pursue a career in a STEM related field; STEM refers to the fields of study science, technology, engineering, and mathematics. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Gresham (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Gresham (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 935 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/16/2014 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | Senate | S. concurred in H. am. #2 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1158) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1157) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 24, Nays 0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0977) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Recalled from S. F,W&M Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2295 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935