TN SB2399 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 912
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 912
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the fee that court clerks may charge for selling real or personal property under decree of court, and receiving, collecting, and paying out the proceeds; specifies that special commissioners who are appointed by a court to sell property will not be permitted to take a commission in excess of the amount of the fee that court clerks may charge for selling real or personal property under decree of court, and receiving, collecting, and paying out the proceeds; requires that judicial trust sales not occur on Sundays or state or federal legal holidays.
Title
As enacted, changes the fee that court clerks may charge for selling real or personal property under decree of court, and receiving, collecting, and paying out the proceeds; specifies that special commissioners who are appointed by a court to sell property will not be permitted to take a commission in excess of the amount of the fee that court clerks may charge for selling real or personal property under decree of court, and receiving, collecting, and paying out the proceeds; requires that judicial trust sales not occur on Sundays or state or federal legal holidays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 912 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1083) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1056) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2208 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 912