TN SB2252 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 999
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 999
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the commissioner from adding points to a driver record involving accidents that were reported on the Tennessee Uniform Traffic Crash Report as a "vehicle special use (09) police", "(10) ambulance", or "(11) fire apparatus" and on which the driver presence is reported as "driver operated government vehicle", so long as the driver is not charged with vehicular assault, vehicular homicide, aggravated vehicular homicide, reckless driving, or DUI. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As enacted, prohibits the commissioner from adding points to a driver record involving accidents that were reported on the Tennessee Uniform Traffic Crash Report as a "vehicle special use (09) police", "(10) ambulance", or "(11) fire apparatus" and on which the driver presence is reported as "driver operated government vehicle", so long as the driver is not charged with vehicular assault, vehicular homicide, aggravated vehicular homicide, reckless driving, or DUI. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 999 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 2 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1203) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0680) |
2014-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0699) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0657) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 2/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans & Safety Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2110 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 999