TN SB2079 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 990
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the treasurer to recommend to the TCRS board of trustees a funding policy with respect to TCRS; enacts the "Public Employee Defined Benefit Financial Security Act of 2014"; revises other benefit-related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 37, Part 3 and Title 9, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the treasurer to recommend to the TCRS board of trustees a funding policy with respect to TCRS; enacts the "Public Employee Defined Benefit Financial Security Act of 2014"; revises other benefit-related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 37, Part 3 and Title 9, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-16 - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03HousePub. Ch. 990
2014-06-03HouseEffective date(s) 05/22/2014
2014-05-22HouseSigned by Governor.
2014-05-13HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2014-05-07HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2014-05-01HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2014-04-24HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2014-04-16HouseS. concurred in H. am. 3
2014-04-16HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2014
2014-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0
2014-04-15HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA0958)
2014-04-15HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0704)
2014-04-15HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0631)
2014-04-15HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2014-03-06SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2014-03-03SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2014-03-03SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 0
2014-03-03SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0662)
2014-03-03SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0597)
2014-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/3/2014
2014-02-27SenateS. Reset on Cal. for 3/3/2014
2014-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/27/2014
2014-02-25SenateRec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm.
2014-02-19SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014
2014-01-29SenateP2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
2014-01-27SenateIntro., P1C.
2014-01-23SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB2037 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 990

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback