TN SB2033 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 909
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 909
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the “Tennessee Patient Safety Cosmetic Medical Procedures Act". - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 4 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, enacts the “Tennessee Patient Safety Cosmetic Medical Procedures Act". - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 4 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 909 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0840) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1103) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0989) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1896 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 909