TN SB1914 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 921
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 921
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, combines the geologists and soil scientists funds to create the new geologist and soil scientist regulatory fund, with moneys from the fund to be used to defray expenses of the Soil Scientist Licensure Act and the Geologist Licensure Act. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 18, Part 2 and Title 62, Chapter 36.
Title
As enacted, combines the geologists and soil scientists funds to create the new geologist and soil scientist regulatory fund, with moneys from the fund to be used to defray expenses of the Soil Scientist Licensure Act and the Geologist Licensure Act. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 18, Part 2 and Title 62, Chapter 36.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Pub. Ch. 921 |
2014-05-29 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2394 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 921