TN SB1908 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 877
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 877
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment of 2014". - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 250 of the Public Acts of 2013.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment of 2014". - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 250 of the Public Acts of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Pub. Ch. 877 |
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-15 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2014-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1216) |
2014-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0897) |
2014-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1023) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0761) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 4/2/14 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/10/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1950 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 877