TN SB1904 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 828
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 828
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes pharmacists to submit data entry error corrections concerning errors in the submission of purchases of immediate methamphetamine precursor to the NPLEx and prohibits stop sale orders with respect to cases where the correction applies. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-431 and Title 53, Chapter 10.
Title
As enacted, authorizes pharmacists to submit data entry error corrections concerning errors in the submission of purchases of immediate methamphetamine precursor to the NPLEx and prohibits stop sale orders with respect to cases where the correction applies. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-431 and Title 53, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Pub. Ch. 828 |
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-04-29 | House | Governor returned. |
2014-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-14 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0890) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | S. Reset on S. Regular Calendar 3/27/14 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. H&W Comm. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1858 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 828