TN SB1751 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 906
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 906
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the sale of products containing ephedrine and pseudoephedrine. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the sale of products containing ephedrine and pseudoephedrine. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 906 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - SA1177) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA1176) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1159) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. H&W Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1574 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 906