TN SB1477 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 942
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 942
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes certain changes and additions to present law concerning the gross receipts tax in regard to businesses in Classification 5; adds persons engaged in the business of making sales as a natural gas marketer to Classification 5. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, makes certain changes and additions to present law concerning the gross receipts tax in regard to businesses in Classification 5; adds persons engaged in the business of making sales as a natural gas marketer to Classification 5. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 942 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 1 |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1202) |
2014-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1124) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/recommend, as amended |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1536 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 942