TN SB1468 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to home school requirements. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3050.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to home school requirements. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3050.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499 | |
2011-05-19 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0313) | |
2011-05-19 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-19 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/5/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/5/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1631 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 499