TN SB1307 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, encourages the commission to prescribe high performance building requirements and other standards, and promulgate rules, which meet or exceed the 2005 Sustainable Design Guidelines that the commission implemented, that are necessary to ensure all state buildings perform in an energy efficient manner; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 43 and Title 49, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, encourages the commission to prescribe high performance building requirements and other standards, and promulgate rules, which meet or exceed the 2005 Sustainable Design Guidelines that the commission implemented, that are necessary to ensure all state buildings perform in an energy efficient manner; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 43 and Title 49, Chapter 17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-22SenateComp. became Pub. Ch. 363
2013-04-17SenateComp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2013-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2013
2013-04-10SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
2013-04-02SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
2013-02-25SenateP2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-02-21SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-02-14SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1268 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 363

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback