TN SB1172 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that liquefied natural gas motor fuel be sold in diesel gallon equivalents and that compressed natural gas motor fuel be sold in gasoline gallon equivalents or diesel gallon equivalents; requires the commissioner of agriculture to promulgate rules that are necessary to establish conversion units from mass to gasoline gallon equivalents and from mass to diesel gallon equivalents. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 26.
Title
As enacted, requires that liquefied natural gas motor fuel be sold in diesel gallon equivalents and that compressed natural gas motor fuel be sold in gasoline gallon equivalents or diesel gallon equivalents; requires the commissioner of agriculture to promulgate rules that are necessary to establish conversion units from mass to gasoline gallon equivalents and from mass to diesel gallon equivalents. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 26.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 308 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0326) |
2015-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0195) |
2015-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0245) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0315) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1167 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 308