TN SB1112 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 723
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 723
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state board of education to develop a uniform grading system for students enrolled in grades kindergarten through eight that LEAs may adopt and implement. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires the state board of education to develop a uniform grading system for students enrolled in grades kindergarten through eight that LEAs may adopt and implement. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Rec. for passage, with amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 723 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0901) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1179 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 723