TN SB0548 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Failed In S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 6 PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Failed In S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 6 PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits motorcyle operators who have certain minimum insurance coverage, a motorcycle safety course, and other requirements upon payment of $50.00 fee to receive special sticker upon renewal of registration permitting the person to ride motorcycle without a crash helmet. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, permits motorcyle operators who have certain minimum insurance coverage, a motorcycle safety course, and other requirements upon payment of $50.00 fee to receive special sticker upon renewal of registration permitting the person to ride motorcycle without a crash helmet. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments - FAILED (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Failed In S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 6 PNV 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0044 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee