TN SB0142 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-20 - Pub. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows person with a valid handgun carry permit to transport and store a firearm or firearm ammunition in the permit holder's privately-owned motor vehicle in public or private parking areas under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, allows person with a valid handgun carry permit to transport and store a firearm or firearm ammunition in the permit holder's privately-owned motor vehicle in public or private parking areas under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 13 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 12 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 11 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 10 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 9 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY Pody PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Miller PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Windle PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Windle PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Windle PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Kyle (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-20HousePub. Ch. 16
2013-03-20HouseEffective date(s) 07/01/2013
2013-03-14HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-03-05HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-03-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-03-04HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-02-28HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-02-28HousePassed H., Ayes 72, Nays 22
2013-02-28HouseAm. 2-13 tabled.
2013-02-28HouseAm. 1 withdrawn.
2013-02-28HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-02-13SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-02-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-02-11SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 28, Nays 5
2013-02-11SenateAm. 2 tabled
2013-02-11SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0004)
2013-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/11/2013
2013-02-05SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2013-01-30SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/5/2013
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-28SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0118 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 16

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback