TN SB0049 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-10 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-10 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the teaching of or furnishing of materials on human sexuality other than heterosexuality in public school grades K-8. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the teaching of or furnishing of materials on human sexuality other than heterosexuality in public school grades K-8. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 5 BY Roberts (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-10 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-20 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-20 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 19, Nays 10 | |
2011-05-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA0439) | |
2011-05-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0438) | |
2011-05-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0421) | |
2011-05-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0312) | |
2011-05-20 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 5 of 0 - SA0622) | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-12 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | Passed S., Ayes 0, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/5/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/5/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-02-07 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0229 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-17 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee