TN SB0004 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee standards commission to recommend curriculum standards to the state board for adoption. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, creates the Tennessee standards commission to recommend curriculum standards to the state board for adoption. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2014-11-17 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1280 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0004&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0004.pdf |