TN HJR0548 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Makes application to Congress for the purpose of calling a convention of states concerning balanced budgeting.
Title
Makes application to Congress for the purpose of calling a convention of states concerning balanced budgeting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: recomend for concurrence (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: recomend for concurrence (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-10 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 89, Nays 2, PNV 3 |
2014-03-10 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0761) |
2014-03-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |