TN HB0375 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes date by which the 20-percent target goal for state agencies to reduce or displace the use of petroleum products in state owned motor vehicle fleets must be met to January 1, 2015; requires entities to initiate plan implementation by January 1, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 22, Part 1 and Section 4-3-1109.
Title
As enacted, changes date by which the 20-percent target goal for state agencies to reduce or displace the use of petroleum products in state owned motor vehicle fleets must be met to January 1, 2015; requires entities to initiate plan implementation by January 1, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 22, Part 1 and Section 4-3-1109.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 228 |
2013-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0578 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 228