TN HB2387 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 805
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 805
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows notaries public to charge reasonable fees for their services instead of statutorily fixed fees; provides that notaries public are approved by the governor instead of commissioned by the governor. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 18.
Title
As enacted, allows notaries public to charge reasonable fees for their services instead of statutorily fixed fees; provides that notaries public are approved by the governor instead of commissioned by the governor. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 805 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Effective date(s) 10/01/2014 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 94, Nays 2 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 24, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S. adopted am. #1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-27 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 66, Nays 25, PNV 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2341 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 805