TN HB2278 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 884
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 884
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various cross-references addressing the nonapplicability or qualified applicability of certain provisions of the Tennessee Nonprofit Corporation Act to cooperatives. - Amends TCA Section 48-69-122 and Section 65-25-225.
Title
As enacted, revises various cross-references addressing the nonapplicability or qualified applicability of certain provisions of the Tennessee Nonprofit Corporation Act to cooperatives. - Amends TCA Section 48-69-122 and Section 65-25-225.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Business and Utilities Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Business and Utilities Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 884 |
2014-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Action Def. in Business and Utilities Committee to last calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2014-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2203 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 884