TN HB2211 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions governing projects and qualified public use facilities to change the amount of the aggregate investment of public or private funds from "in excess of $200 million" to "in excess of $75 million". - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53 and Title 7, Chapter 88.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions governing projects and qualified public use facilities to change the amount of the aggregate investment of public or private funds from "in excess of $200 million" to "in excess of $75 million". - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53 and Title 7, Chapter 88.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962 |
2014-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1858 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 962