TN HB2137 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 973
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 973
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises qualifications for employee and server permits issued by the commission. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, revises qualifications for employee and server permits issued by the commission. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 973 |
2014-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Re-referred To: Government Operations Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Government Operations for review |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-27 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2261 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 973