TN HB2027 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a winery or farm wine producer to conduct business at satellite locations; requires all payments to wholesalers by licensees be made by electronic funds transfer, credit card, debit card, or such other method that will facilitate full payment at or near the time of delivery; revises other various provisions governing alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a winery or farm wine producer to conduct business at satellite locations; requires all payments to wholesalers by licensees be made by electronic funds transfer, credit card, debit card, or such other method that will facilitate full payment at or near the time of delivery; revises other various provisions governing alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015 |
2014-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-02-25 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2415 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1015