TN HB1906 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 687
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 687
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows LEAs to teach the history of traditional winter celebrations; allows students and staff to use traditional greetings of such celebrations; and allows LEAs to display winter celebration scenes or symbols under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, allows LEAs to teach the history of traditional winter celebrations; allows students and staff to use traditional greetings of such celebrations; and allows LEAs to display winter celebration scenes or symbols under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 687 |
2014-03-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-10 | House | Reset on Next Available Regular cal. |
2014-03-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1425 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 687